Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Heidi Boline Christiansen | 01.08.2004 | 02.09.2014 | direktion |
Henrik Gert Sørensen | 30.01.1991 | 01.08.2004 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Heidi Boline Christiansen | 01.05.2008 | 02.09.2014 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Gert Sørensen | 01.03.1998 | 01.08.2004 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Christiansen | 30.01.1991 | 02.09.2014 | bestyrelse |
Willy Gertsen | 30.01.1991 | 30.04.2008 | bestyrelse |
Jan Frederiksen | 30.01.1991 | 01.03.1998 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Gert Sørensen | 30.01.1991 | 08.11.1995 | bestyrelse |
Willy Gertsen | 30.01.1991 | 15.02.1993 | bestyrelse |