Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Stig Rømer Winther | 01.01.1991 | 16.02.1993 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.01.1991 | 12.06.1991 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Philip Andrea Stoltze Rasmussen | 01.01.1991 | 17.03.1993 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.01.1991 | 12.06.1991 | bestyrelse |