Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
John Porsdal | 01.01.1991 | 08.01.1998 | direktion |
Poul-Erik Mortensen | 01.01.1991 | 01.08.1995 | direktion |
Bent Steen Hansen | 01.01.1991 | 12.07.1994 | direktion |
Ole Elgård Nielsen | 01.01.1991 | 11.11.1992 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.01.1991 | 14.06.1991 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Henrik Mortensen | 01.01.1991 | 08.01.1998 | bestyrelse |
Jens Carl Thorup | 01.01.1991 | 08.01.1998 | formand |
John Porsdal | 01.01.1991 | 08.01.1998 | næstformand |
Poul-Erik Mortensen | 01.01.1991 | 01.08.1995 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Christian Jürgensen | 01.01.1991 | 14.01.1994 | bestyrelse |
Hans Henrik Mortensen | 01.01.1991 | 11.11.1992 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.01.1991 | 14.06.1991 | bestyrelse |