Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Eigil Egon Wulff | 01.01.1991 | 20.02.2001 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.01.1991 | 26.07.1991 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Eigil Egon Wulff | 28.10.1996 | 20.02.2001 | bestyrelse |
Michael Frørup | 28.10.1996 | 19.04.1999 | bestyrelse |
Skjalm Vagn von Bülow | 28.10.1996 | 19.04.1999 | formand |