Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Michael Petersen | 20.12.1990 | 19.02.2001 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bo Petersen | 27.12.2000 | 19.02.2001 | bestyrelse |
Helle Petersen | 03.07.2000 | 16.11.2000 | bestyrelse |
Torsten Pedersen | 21.12.1999 | 03.07.2000 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Esbern Philipsen | 21.12.1999 | 30.05.2000 | bestyrelse |
Carl Flemming Rasmussen | 22.06.1998 | 19.02.2001 | bestyrelse |
Michael Pedersen | 22.06.1998 | 21.12.1999 | bestyrelse |
Tommy Dominic | 22.06.1998 | 31.07.1999 | bestyrelse |
Michael Petersen | 20.12.1990 | 19.02.2001 | bestyrelse |
Tommy Petersen | 20.12.1990 | 11.08.1999 | bestyrelse |
Jan Willy Petersen | 20.12.1990 | 22.06.1998 | bestyrelse |