Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Peter Rasmussen | 30.06.2012 | 27.11.2012 | adm. dir |
John Basland | 01.09.1990 | 30.06.2012 | direktion |
Tove Guldhammer Basland | 01.09.1990 | 11.04.1995 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.09.1990 | 01.03.1991 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Terney | 30.06.2012 | 27.11.2012 | bestyrelse |
Jess Ørgaard Libak Tropp | 30.06.2012 | 27.11.2012 | bestyrelse |
Michael Haaning | 30.06.2012 | 27.11.2012 | formand |
Peter Christiansen | 15.03.2011 | 30.06.2012 | formand |
Kim Koch | 26.02.2006 | 30.06.2012 | bestyrelse |
Theodor Fritz Kørner | 29.02.1996 | 26.02.2006 | bestyrelse |
John Basland | 01.09.1990 | 30.06.2012 | bestyrelse |
Tove Guldhammer Basland | 01.09.1990 | 15.03.2011 | formand |
Arne Olsen | 01.09.1990 | 28.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
John Poul Jørgensen | 01.09.1990 | 11.04.1995 | formand |
Erik Mathiassen | 01.09.1990 | 11.04.1995 | næstformand |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.09.1990 | 01.03.1991 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.09.1990 | 01.03.1991 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.09.1990 | 01.03.1991 | formand |