Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Uffe Bruhn Hansen | 01.04.2003 | 29.06.2004 | direktion |
Hanne Køpke Petersen | 01.04.2003 | 01.04.2003 | adm. dir |
Evald Dam Petersen | 01.11.1990 | 18.02.2003 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1990 | 24.04.1991 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hanne Køpke Petersen | 01.04.2003 | 17.09.2003 | bestyrelse |
Christoph Urs Loosli | 01.04.2003 | 17.09.2003 | bestyrelse |
Uffe Bruhn Hansen | 15.11.2000 | 17.09.2003 | bestyrelse |
Svend Åge Birk Jakobsen | 01.11.1990 | 01.04.2003 | bestyrelse |
Paul Erik Jørgensen | 01.11.1990 | 01.04.2003 | bestyrelse |
Evald Dam Petersen | 01.11.1990 | 18.02.2003 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.11.1990 | 24.04.1991 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1990 | 24.04.1991 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.11.1990 | 24.04.1991 | formand |