Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Christian Møller Johannsen | 29.05.2006 | 27.11.2006 | direktion |
Uffe Hansen | 01.02.2005 | 29.05.2006 | direktion |
Christian Møller Johannsen | 13.01.2004 | 01.02.2005 | direktion |
Ole Frydkjær Petersen | 06.04.1999 | 13.01.2004 | direktion |
Ole Henning Holm | 01.11.1990 | 06.04.1999 | direktion |
Jørn Holm | 01.11.1990 | 04.03.1994 | direktion |
Allan Jeppesen | 01.11.1990 | 24.01.1994 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1990 | 22.03.1991 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kenneth Ellegård Gravesen | 29.05.2006 | 27.11.2006 | bestyrelse |
Jeanette Wittendorff Gravesen | 27.02.2006 | 27.11.2006 | bestyrelse |
Uffe Hansen | 12.09.2005 | 29.05.2006 | bestyrelse |
Knud Hesselvig | 12.09.2005 | 27.02.2006 | formand |
Kenneth Ellegård Gravesen | 22.01.2004 | 12.09.2005 | bestyrelse |
Christian Møller Johannsen | 29.04.2003 | 27.11.2006 | bestyrelse |
Kim Birkelund Pedersen | 29.04.2003 | 12.09.2005 | formand |
Ole Nyvold | 18.01.2001 | 29.04.2003 | formand |
Mogens Jensen | 01.09.1999 | 18.01.2001 | formand |
Ole Frydkjær Petersen | 06.04.1999 | 12.09.2005 | bestyrelse |
Jørn Henningsen | 06.04.1999 | 16.09.2002 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Fatum Stoltenberg | 06.04.1999 | 01.09.1999 | formand |
Ole Henning Holm | 01.11.1990 | 06.04.1999 | bestyrelse |
Marie Louise Holm | 01.11.1990 | 06.04.1999 | bestyrelse |
Jørn Holm | 01.11.1990 | 06.04.1999 | bestyrelse |
Jane Holm | 01.11.1990 | 06.04.1999 | bestyrelse |
Alex Bjerg Iversen | 01.11.1990 | 24.01.1994 | bestyrelse |
John Schlander | 01.11.1990 | 24.01.1994 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Ploug | 01.11.1990 | 24.01.1994 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.11.1990 | 22.03.1991 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1990 | 22.03.1991 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.11.1990 | 22.03.1991 | formand |