Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Leif Larsen | 01.09.1990 | 05.05.2002 | direktion |
Oluf Jensen | 01.09.1990 | 04.07.2001 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.09.1990 | 08.10.1991 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.09.1990 | 08.10.1991 | bestyrelse |