Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
John Iversen | 25.03.1963 | 16.12.1996 | direktion |
Per Arnold Hansen | 25.03.1963 | 19.08.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
John Iversen | 25.03.1963 | 16.12.1996 | bestyrelse |
Claes Colberg | 25.03.1963 | 16.12.1996 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne Gottlieb | 25.03.1963 | 16.12.1996 | bestyrelse |
Poul Erik Mikkelsen | 25.03.1963 | 14.10.1994 | bestyrelse |
Mette Due Daugaard-Petersen | 25.03.1963 | 14.10.1994 | bestyrelse |
Kirsten Hansen | 25.03.1963 | 19.08.1993 | bestyrelse |
Per Arnold Hansen | 25.03.1963 | 19.08.1993 | bestyrelse |
Ole Schultz Hansen | 25.03.1963 | 19.08.1993 | bestyrelse |
Ulla Buus Hansen | 25.03.1963 | 19.08.1993 | bestyrelse |