Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Gerhard Gunnar Arnold Sundman | 01.06.1976 | 17.07.1991 | direktion |
Erik Rud Brandt | 01.06.1976 | 20.04.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Gerhard Gunnar Arnold Sundman | 01.06.1976 | 17.07.1991 | bestyrelse |
John Korsø Jensen | 01.06.1976 | 22.04.1991 | bestyrelse |
Arne Steen Hansen | 01.06.1976 | 22.04.1991 | bestyrelse |