Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Claus Eskildsen | 20.04.2016 | 15.11.2017 | adm. dir |
Niels Sabroe Alsted | 13.02.2008 | 20.04.2016 | adm. dir |
Henning Christensen | 01.08.1990 | 13.02.2008 | direktion |
Orla Bent Jensen | 01.08.1990 | 19.06.1991 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.08.1990 | 19.12.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Claus Eskildsen | 20.04.2016 | 15.11.2017 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Per Sorvad Christensen | 28.05.2010 | 15.11.2017 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Stentebjerg | 31.01.2008 | 15.11.2017 | formand |
Niels Sabroe Alsted | 31.01.2008 | 20.04.2016 | bestyrelse |
Jan Sverre Røsstad | 31.01.2008 | 28.05.2010 | bestyrelse |
Tore Gunnar Wikdal | 31.01.2008 | 28.05.2010 | bestyrelse |
Stoffel Flikweert | 01.05.2004 | 31.01.2008 | bestyrelse |
Roelof Raterink | 01.05.2004 | 31.01.2008 | bestyrelse |
Jan Scheurwater | 01.05.2004 | 31.01.2008 | bestyrelse |
Henning Christensen | 01.08.1990 | 31.01.2008 | bestyrelse |
Laurence Edward Schaab | 01.08.1990 | 31.01.2008 | bestyrelse |
Willem Troost | 01.08.1990 | 31.01.2008 | formand |
Niels Johansen | 01.08.1990 | 19.07.1996 | bestyrelse |
René Valentin | 01.08.1990 | 19.07.1996 | bestyrelse |
Ole Christensen | 01.08.1990 | 19.07.1996 | bestyrelse |
Per Christian Møller | 01.08.1990 | 19.07.1996 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Søndergaard Rasmussen | 01.08.1990 | 04.09.1995 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne Anders Rasmussen | 01.08.1990 | 01.05.1992 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.08.1990 | 19.12.1990 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.08.1990 | 19.12.1990 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.08.1990 | 19.12.1990 | formand |