Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Robert Birk | 01.08.1990 | 08.07.2000 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.08.1990 | 17.12.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Knud Thyboe Christensen | 01.08.1990 | 08.07.2000 | bestyrelse |
Lars Robert Birk | 01.08.1990 | 08.07.2000 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Niebuhr-Jørgensen | 01.08.1990 | 08.07.2000 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Rabis Vesterager | 01.08.1990 | 18.09.1991 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.08.1990 | 17.12.1990 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.08.1990 | 17.12.1990 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.08.1990 | 17.12.1990 | formand |