Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mahmoud Anissi | 15.04.1999 | 21.08.2003 | direktion |
Marianne Møller Nielsen | 10.10.1997 | 15.04.1999 | direktion |
John Børge Mortensen | 01.06.1990 | 10.10.1997 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.06.1990 | 23.01.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bent Vagn Schultze | 01.06.1990 | 10.10.1997 | bestyrelse |
John Børge Mortensen | 01.06.1990 | 10.10.1997 | bestyrelse |
Birgitta Ingegerd Hansen | 01.06.1990 | 10.10.1997 | bestyrelse |