Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Bresling | 01.07.1990 | 14.01.2013 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.07.1990 | 15.07.1991 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Bresling | 01.07.1990 | 21.09.2004 | bestyrelse |
Michael Christian Bertelsen | 01.07.1990 | 21.09.2004 | formand |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.07.1990 | 15.07.1991 | bestyrelse |