Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kristian Wulff | 01.10.1997 | 07.01.2002 | direktion |
Steen Hummeluhr | 01.07.1990 | 01.10.1997 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.07.1990 | 21.02.1991 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kristian Wulff | 01.10.1997 | 07.01.2002 | bestyrelse |
Göran R Svensson | 01.10.1997 | 30.10.1998 | formand |
Ragnwalth Larsson | 26.02.1997 | 07.01.2002 | bestyrelse |
Peter Hummeluhr | 14.11.1996 | 26.02.1997 | bestyrelse |
Birgit Normark Hummeluhr | 14.11.1996 | 26.02.1997 | bestyrelse |
Bjørn Georg Anfindsen Sibbern | 01.07.1990 | 01.10.1997 | bestyrelse |
Niels Hummeluhr | 01.07.1990 | 01.10.1997 | formand |
Steen Hummeluhr | 01.07.1990 | 26.02.1997 | bestyrelse |
Tom Vilhelm Petersen | 01.07.1990 | 14.11.1996 | bestyrelse |
Michael Gjedde-Nielsen | 01.07.1990 | 05.04.1993 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.07.1990 | 21.02.1991 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.07.1990 | 21.02.1991 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.07.1990 | 21.02.1991 | formand |