Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Torben Stubberup | 01.07.1990 | 29.09.1995 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.07.1990 | 29.11.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bernth Flemming Nilsson | 01.07.1990 | 29.09.1995 | bestyrelse |
Martin Hector | 01.07.1990 | 29.09.1995 | bestyrelse |
Ernst Jensen | 01.07.1990 | 29.09.1995 | bestyrelse |
Villy Bryde | 01.07.1990 | 29.09.1995 | bestyrelse |
Egon Tønnesen | 01.07.1990 | 29.09.1995 | bestyrelse |
Børge Johannes Borg | 01.07.1990 | 27.12.1990 | bestyrelse |
Torben Stubberup | 01.07.1990 | 27.12.1990 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.07.1990 | 29.11.1990 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.07.1990 | 29.11.1990 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.07.1990 | 29.11.1990 | formand |