Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
John Tyrrestrup | 18.06.2002 | 01.07.2003 | adm. dir |
Karsten Dennis Hansen | 11.06.2002 | 18.06.2002 | adm. dir |
Jimmy Vitved | 01.07.1990 | 11.06.2002 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.07.1990 | 28.02.1991 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
John Tyrrestrup | 18.06.2002 | 01.07.2003 | bestyrelse |
Paul Martin Mollerup | 12.06.2002 | 01.07.2003 | formand |
Karsten Dennis Hansen | 11.06.2002 | 18.06.2002 | bestyrelse |
John Tyrrestrup | 01.09.2001 | 12.06.2002 | formand |
Jørgen Clausen | 01.02.1998 | 31.08.2001 | formand |
Jimmy Vitved | 01.07.1990 | 11.06.2002 | bestyrelse |
Per Skov | 01.07.1990 | 31.01.1998 | bestyrelse |