Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Flemming Ploug Jensen | 15.08.1990 | 22.08.2003 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jakob Kristensen | 29.06.2001 | 22.08.2003 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Ploug Jensen | 15.08.1990 | 22.08.2003 | bestyrelse |
Trine Kristensen | 15.08.1990 | 22.08.2003 | bestyrelse |
Jette Fallemann Nicolajsen | 15.08.1990 | 22.08.2003 | bestyrelse |
Kai Kristensen | 15.08.1990 | 22.08.2003 | formand |
Dorthe Kristensen | 15.08.1990 | 11.06.1993 | bestyrelse |