Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ann-Charlotte Nielsen | 20.06.1990 | 22.01.2021 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Hilmer Larsen | 11.06.2007 | 09.05.2016 | bestyrelse |
Jens Peter Bloch | 11.06.2007 | 09.05.2016 | formand |
Stig Nielsen | 11.06.2007 | 21.05.2013 | bestyrelse |
Johannes Christian Quist | 09.10.1996 | 11.06.2007 | bestyrelse |
Ann-Charlotte Nielsen | 20.06.1990 | 09.05.2016 | bestyrelse |
Erik Jan Nielsen | 20.06.1990 | 11.06.2007 | formand |
Palle Murmann | 20.06.1990 | 09.10.1996 | bestyrelse |