Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Seest Egly | 19.06.1990 | 28.09.2012 | direktion |
Ole Willy Mandrup Rasmussen | 19.06.1990 | 13.04.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Seest Egly | 19.06.1990 | 03.04.2008 | bestyrelse |
Ole Møller Jespersen | 19.06.1990 | 03.04.2008 | bestyrelse |
Janeck Leo Hillers | 19.06.1990 | 03.04.2008 | bestyrelse |
Kent Nilsson | 19.06.1990 | 06.05.1993 | bestyrelse |