Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
John Cay Cumberland Jacobsen | 15.03.1999 | 21.08.2006 | direktion |
Helge Bøtner Petersen | 01.06.1990 | 15.03.1999 | direktion |
Bjarne Cumberland Jacobsen | 01.06.1990 | 27.04.1995 | direktion |
Bjarne Cumberland Jacobsen | 01.06.1990 | 23.07.1993 | direktion |
John Cay Cumberland Jacobsen | 01.06.1990 | 30.07.1991 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.06.1990 | 11.02.1991 | direktion |