Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bo Allan Fogtmann | 01.05.1990 | 22.12.1997 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.05.1990 | 11.04.1994 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bo Allan Fogtmann | 01.05.1990 | 22.12.1997 | bestyrelse |
Silvia Jutta Gertrud Fogtmann | 01.05.1990 | 22.12.1997 | bestyrelse |
Lisbeth Klingert | 01.05.1990 | 19.06.1996 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Krüger | 01.05.1990 | 19.06.1996 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.05.1990 | 11.04.1994 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.05.1990 | 11.04.1994 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.05.1990 | 11.04.1994 | formand |