Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Gorm Skovgaard Christensen | 01.05.1990 | 30.04.2001 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.05.1990 | 10.12.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Karen Marie Klinkvort | 31.05.1997 | 30.04.2001 | formand |
Gorm Skovgaard Christensen | 01.05.1990 | 30.04.2001 | bestyrelse |
Povl Bayer Knudsen | 01.05.1990 | 30.04.2001 | bestyrelse |
Leo Skovgaard Christensen | 01.05.1990 | 31.05.1997 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.05.1990 | 10.12.1993 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.05.1990 | 10.12.1993 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.05.1990 | 10.12.1993 | formand |