Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Morten Østergaard | 01.03.1990 | 27.12.2013 | direktion |
Peter Rohde Andersen | 01.03.1990 | 27.12.2013 | direktion |
Henrik Bodholdt | 01.03.1990 | 15.11.1994 | direktion |
Helle Rabøl Hansen | 01.03.1990 | 07.09.1993 | direktion |
Lars Orlamundt | 01.03.1990 | 21.10.1992 | direktion |