Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Michael Rasmussen | 15.03.1990 | 14.03.2001 | direktion |
Michael Rasmussen | 15.03.1990 | 10.05.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henning Rasmussen | 30.11.1996 | 14.03.2001 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Leon Rasmussen | 30.11.1996 | 14.03.2001 | bestyrelse |
Michael Rasmussen | 15.03.1990 | 14.03.2001 | bestyrelse |
Knud Bille | 15.03.1990 | 05.02.1997 | bestyrelse |
Dorthe Nielsen | 15.03.1990 | 01.07.1996 | bestyrelse |