Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jytte Lisbeth Kokholm | 01.04.1990 | 13.07.2000 | direktion |
Jens Peder Kokholm | 01.04.1990 | 13.07.2000 | direktion |
Vagn Toft Jensen | 01.04.1990 | 29.08.1991 | direktion |
Søren Stenum | 01.04.1990 | 22.02.1991 | direktion |
Preben Bang Henriksen | 01.04.1990 | 05.09.1990 | direktion |