Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
John Buchanan Lademann | 01.03.1990 | 14.11.1995 | direktion |
Heine Bækgaard | 01.03.1990 | 13.07.1993 | direktion |
Hans Jørgen Kurt Mathias | 01.03.1990 | 17.09.1992 | direktion |
Klaus Georg Brodersen | 01.03.1990 | 11.02.1991 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.03.1990 | 20.09.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Oscar Thomsen | 01.03.1990 | 14.11.1995 | bestyrelse |
Oluf Iversen | 01.03.1990 | 14.11.1995 | bestyrelse |
Erling Christensen | 01.03.1990 | 14.11.1995 | bestyrelse |
John Buchanan Lademann | 01.03.1990 | 13.07.1993 | bestyrelse |
Klaus Georg Brodersen | 01.03.1990 | 30.01.1991 | bestyrelse |
Anne Stenild | 01.03.1990 | 30.01.1991 | bestyrelse |
Hans Jørgen Kurt Mathias | 01.03.1990 | 30.01.1991 | bestyrelse |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.03.1990 | 20.09.1990 | bestyrelse |
Charlotte Biil | 01.03.1990 | 20.09.1990 | bestyrelse |
Asbjørn Christoffersen | 01.03.1990 | 20.09.1990 | bestyrelse |