Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bryan Göddert | 01.09.2010 | 21.12.2010 | direktion |
Jens Rudolf | 20.03.1990 | 31.08.2010 | direktion |
Finn Hansen | 20.03.1990 | 03.06.1994 | direktion |
August Jes Jørgensen | 20.03.1990 | 29.10.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Leif Ole Bondam | 01.09.2010 | 21.12.2010 | bestyrelse |
Bryan Göddert | 01.09.2010 | 21.12.2010 | bestyrelse |
Kent Laursen | 01.09.2010 | 21.12.2010 | bestyrelse |
Hanne Rudolf | 09.05.2005 | 31.08.2010 | bestyrelse |
Jens Rudolf | 20.03.1990 | 31.08.2010 | bestyrelse |
Finn Hansen | 20.03.1990 | 31.08.2010 | bestyrelse |
Jan Kempf | 20.03.1990 | 09.05.2005 | bestyrelse |
Jakob Holm | 20.03.1990 | 09.05.2005 | bestyrelse |