Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kirsten Scherer | 01.02.1990 | 20.01.1994 | direktion |
Peter Edvin Heiberg | 01.02.1990 | 05.12.1991 | direktion |
Steen Schierbeck | 01.02.1990 | 26.09.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kirsten Scherer | 01.02.1990 | 13.04.1992 | formand |
Peter Edvin Heiberg | 01.02.1990 | 05.12.1991 | bestyrelse |
Jane Rasmussen | 01.02.1990 | 05.12.1991 | bestyrelse |