Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ole Kjærgård | 19.12.1996 | 18.12.1997 | direktion |
Jens Belling | 01.03.1990 | 19.12.1996 | direktion |
Bent Belling | 01.03.1990 | 25.05.1993 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.03.1990 | 08.10.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ole Kjærgård | 19.12.1996 | 18.12.1997 | bestyrelse |
Bent Kristoffersen | 19.12.1996 | 18.12.1997 | bestyrelse |
Torben Risvig Flyvholm | 19.12.1996 | 01.05.1997 | bestyrelse |
Jens Belling | 01.03.1990 | 18.12.1997 | bestyrelse |