Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Georg Duer | 20.06.1997 | 04.01.2017 | direktion |
Signe Malene Berg | 11.09.1996 | 20.06.1997 | direktion |
Erik Berg | 15.01.1990 | 11.09.1996 | direktion |
Signe Malene Berg | 15.01.1990 | 22.09.1993 | direktion |
Erik Berg | 15.01.1990 | 08.01.1992 | direktion |
Bent Edvard Roland Hansen | 15.01.1990 | 03.06.1991 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Georg Duer | 20.06.1997 | 14.11.2011 | bestyrelse |
Joanna Esmé Duer | 20.06.1997 | 14.11.2011 | bestyrelse |
Hanna Esmee Duer | 20.06.1997 | 14.11.2011 | bestyrelse |
Anders Sune Berg | 15.01.1990 | 20.06.1997 | bestyrelse |
Signe Malene Berg | 15.01.1990 | 20.06.1997 | bestyrelse |
Bjørn Heidemann Lassen | 15.01.1990 | 13.03.1997 | bestyrelse |
Jette Bjørn Ottesen | 15.01.1990 | 24.06.1996 | bestyrelse |
Erik Berg | 15.01.1990 | 08.01.1992 | bestyrelse |
Poul Georg Duer | 15.01.1990 | 08.01.1992 | bestyrelse |
Bent Edvard Roland Hansen | 15.01.1990 | 03.06.1991 | bestyrelse |
Torben Erland Larsen | 15.01.1990 | 04.04.1991 | bestyrelse |