Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Pia Abramson | 01.01.1990 | 03.12.1993 | direktion |
Joachim Ralph Posener | 01.01.1990 | 03.12.1993 | direktion |
David Rubin | 01.01.1990 | 18.12.1991 | direktion |
Pia Abramson | 01.01.1990 | 15.07.1991 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.01.1990 | 20.03.1991 | direktion |