Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mogens Kristian Andreassen | 01.02.1990 | 15.11.1993 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.02.1990 | 31.08.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jesper Brenøe Andreassen | 01.02.1990 | 26.11.1993 | bestyrelse |
John Reimer Larsen | 01.02.1990 | 26.11.1993 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Kristian Andreassen | 01.02.1990 | 15.11.1993 | bestyrelse |
Børge Sørensen | 01.02.1990 | 23.10.1992 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.02.1990 | 31.08.1990 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.02.1990 | 31.08.1990 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.02.1990 | 31.08.1990 | formand |