Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ole Erik Fehrn | 01.01.1990 | 17.10.1995 | direktion |
Henning Georg Henriksen | 01.01.1990 | 05.01.1994 | direktion |
Henrik Kløft | 01.01.1990 | 04.02.1991 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.01.1990 | 31.08.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Gert Nielsen | 01.01.1990 | 17.10.1995 | bestyrelse |
Henning Georg Henriksen | 01.01.1990 | 17.10.1995 | bestyrelse |
Ole Erik Fehrn | 01.01.1990 | 17.10.1995 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Kløft | 01.01.1990 | 05.01.1994 | bestyrelse |
Margrethe Hovmann | 01.01.1990 | 05.01.1994 | bestyrelse |