Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bjarne Hansen | 01.01.1990 | 19.11.2004 | direktion |
Preben Bang Henriksen | 01.01.1990 | 01.10.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørn Uffe Bonnesen | 01.01.1990 | 19.11.2004 | bestyrelse |
Karl-Anton Elmlund | 01.01.1990 | 19.11.2004 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne Hansen | 01.01.1990 | 19.11.2004 | bestyrelse |
Torben Wind | 01.01.1990 | 13.11.1991 | bestyrelse |
Preben Bang Henriksen | 01.01.1990 | 01.10.1990 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Gaardboe Bertelsen | 01.01.1990 | 01.10.1990 | bestyrelse |
Lone Mai Henriksen | 01.01.1990 | 01.10.1990 | bestyrelse |