Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Bech Thorsen | 01.12.1989 | 18.04.1995 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.12.1989 | 02.07.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Bech Thorsen | 01.12.1989 | 18.04.1995 | bestyrelse |
Ulla Kloster Thorsen | 01.12.1989 | 18.04.1995 | bestyrelse |
Johannes Elbæk | 01.12.1989 | 18.04.1995 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Vestergaard | 01.12.1989 | 28.01.1994 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.12.1989 | 02.07.1990 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.12.1989 | 02.07.1990 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.12.1989 | 02.07.1990 | formand |