Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Peter Enemark | 01.12.1989 | 01.10.2001 | direktion |
Ivan Klausholt | 01.12.1989 | 30.05.1994 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.12.1989 | 11.06.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørn Simonsen | 01.12.1989 | 01.10.2001 | bestyrelse |
Sven Larsen | 01.12.1989 | 01.10.2001 | bestyrelse |
Jens Peter Enemark | 01.12.1989 | 01.10.2001 | bestyrelse |
Ivan Klausholt | 01.12.1989 | 30.05.1994 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.12.1989 | 11.06.1990 | bestyrelse |