Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mogens Grønning | 01.11.1989 | 11.02.1991 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1989 | 10.09.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Preben Rued Jørgensen | 01.11.1989 | 11.02.1991 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Grønning | 01.11.1989 | 11.02.1991 | bestyrelse |
Michael Kubel | 01.11.1989 | 11.02.1991 | bestyrelse |
Ove Peetz | 01.11.1989 | 19.10.1990 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.11.1989 | 10.09.1990 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1989 | 10.09.1990 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.11.1989 | 10.09.1990 | formand |