Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Leif Bork Christiansen | 01.11.1989 | 19.12.2008 | direktion |
Anna Lise Doward | 01.11.1989 | 25.01.1991 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1989 | 21.05.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Leif Bork Christiansen | 01.11.1989 | 19.12.2008 | bestyrelse |
Per Jørgensen | 01.11.1989 | 19.12.2008 | bestyrelse |
Lis Bente Christiansen | 01.11.1989 | 19.12.2008 | bestyrelse |
Povl-Jørgen Sindberg | 01.11.1989 | 10.11.1992 | bestyrelse |
Steen Sørensen | 01.11.1989 | 16.10.1992 | bestyrelse |
Uwe Teichert | 01.11.1989 | 16.10.1992 | formand |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.11.1989 | 21.05.1990 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1989 | 21.05.1990 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.11.1989 | 21.05.1990 | formand |