Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Daniel Axel Carl Grout | 15.02.2000 | 01.09.2004 | direktion |
Lucien Robert Andre Albin Blanc | 01.09.1997 | 15.02.2000 | direktion |
Christopher Norris Dyer | 01.11.1989 | 01.09.1997 | direktion |
Yves Jean Charles Brissy | 01.11.1989 | 23.03.1994 | direktion |
Louis Marie Cottin | 01.11.1989 | 13.05.1992 | direktion |
Preben Bang Henriksen | 01.11.1989 | 09.04.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Antoine Sacy | 28.07.2003 | 01.09.2004 | bestyrelse |
Daniel Axel Carl Grout | 15.02.2000 | 01.09.2004 | bestyrelse |
Philippe Christian Paul Mattioli | 29.04.1999 | 01.09.2004 | bestyrelse |
Frank Dubourdieu | 29.04.1999 | 01.09.2004 | suppleant |
Lucien Robert Andre Albin Blanc | 01.09.1997 | 15.02.2000 | bestyrelse |
Pierre Alfred Noel Laguerre | 09.12.1996 | 28.07.2003 | formand |
France Nathalie Olivia Marie Hibon Bachelot | 01.11.1989 | 02.11.2000 | suppleant |
Brigitte Mariette Yvonne Roeser-Herlin | 01.11.1989 | 29.04.1999 | bestyrelse |
Philippe Christian Paul Mattioli | 01.11.1989 | 29.04.1999 | suppleant |
Christopher Norris Dyer | 01.11.1989 | 01.09.1997 | bestyrelse |
Nathalie Dominique Dupuis-Hepner | 01.11.1989 | 27.06.1997 | suppleant |
Philippe Michel Jacques Claude Carfantan | 01.11.1989 | 30.04.1997 | suppleant |
Conrad Yvon Eckenschwiller | 01.11.1989 | 09.12.1996 | formand |
Benedicte Marie Solange Mautin | 01.11.1989 | 29.05.1996 | bestyrelse |
Yves Jean Charles Brissy | 01.11.1989 | 29.05.1996 | bestyrelse |
Anders Torbøl | 01.11.1989 | 07.06.1994 | bestyrelse |
Jean Marcel Planet | 01.11.1989 | 02.03.1994 | bestyrelse |
Jean-Michel Andre Daron | 01.11.1989 | 27.04.1993 | bestyrelse |
Louis Marie Cottin | 01.11.1989 | 13.05.1992 | bestyrelse |
Frantz Johannes Dahl | 01.11.1989 | 11.06.1991 | bestyrelse |
Preben Bang Henriksen | 01.11.1989 | 09.04.1990 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Gaardboe Bertelsen | 01.11.1989 | 09.04.1990 | bestyrelse |
Lone Mai Henriksen | 01.11.1989 | 09.04.1990 | bestyrelse |