Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Haustrup | 01.11.1989 | 02.11.1998 | direktion |
Henning Rasmussen | 01.11.1989 | 06.03.1991 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1989 | 05.04.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Rene Mourier | 01.11.1989 | 02.11.1998 | bestyrelse |
Hans Fogh Aagaard | 01.11.1989 | 02.11.1998 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Jacob Anker-Ladefoged | 01.11.1989 | 02.11.1998 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Christian Holger Smidt | 01.11.1989 | 02.11.1998 | bestyrelse |
Adam Carl Moltke-Huitfeldt | 01.11.1989 | 02.11.1998 | bestyrelse |