Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Aage Vestermark | 02.04.2001 | 11.12.2001 | direktion |
Henning Lind Rasmussen | 01.11.1989 | 02.04.2001 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.11.1989 | 25.05.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Veber | 02.04.2001 | 11.12.2001 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Larsen | 02.04.2001 | 11.12.2001 | bestyrelse |
Hans Aage Vestermark | 01.11.1989 | 11.12.2001 | bestyrelse |
Henning Lind Rasmussen | 01.11.1989 | 02.04.2001 | bestyrelse |
Doris Rasmussen | 01.11.1989 | 02.04.2001 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne Nielsen | 01.11.1989 | 09.09.1996 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1989 | 25.05.1990 | bestyrelse |