Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Finn Mulvad Hemme | 26.06.1989 | 08.01.2013 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Svend Oluf Hansen | 19.09.2007 | 08.01.2013 | bestyrelse |
Lene Marie Blaabjerg | 02.04.2004 | 08.01.2013 | formand |
Peter Mikael Jensen | 02.04.2004 | 19.09.2007 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Buch Linaa | 23.06.1999 | 13.11.2003 | bestyrelse |
Claus Sten Rasmussen | 27.05.1998 | 23.06.1999 | bestyrelse |
Finn Mulvad Hemme | 26.06.1989 | 08.01.2013 | bestyrelse |
Edith Mulvad Hemme | 26.06.1989 | 03.08.2003 | bestyrelse |
Annette Karkov | 26.06.1989 | 27.05.1998 | bestyrelse |
Peter Hemme | 26.06.1989 | 21.03.1994 | bestyrelse |