Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bjarne Nielsen | 01.11.1989 | 11.11.1994 | direktion |
Jan Ernstberger | 01.11.1989 | 02.01.1992 | direktion |
Lorenz Peter Beltoft | 01.11.1989 | 18.07.1991 | direktion |
Dan Rybak | 01.11.1989 | 09.04.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Christensen | 01.11.1989 | 11.11.1994 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne Nielsen | 01.11.1989 | 11.11.1994 | bestyrelse |
Jan Ernstberger | 01.11.1989 | 11.11.1994 | formand |
Holger Christiansen | 01.11.1989 | 28.08.1992 | bestyrelse |
Carl Kristian Hansen | 01.11.1989 | 28.08.1992 | bestyrelse |
Dan Rybak | 01.11.1989 | 09.04.1990 | bestyrelse |
Annalise Stege | 01.11.1989 | 09.04.1990 | bestyrelse |
Lise-Lotte Lyng Andersen | 01.11.1989 | 09.04.1990 | formand |