Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
John Anderberg | 27.10.1989 | 10.08.2016 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Maria Anderberg | 20.01.2012 | 10.08.2016 | bestyrelse |
Anne Helle | 14.12.2007 | 10.08.2016 | formand |
Lars Gøtterup | 31.05.2001 | 20.01.2012 | bestyrelse |
Keld Harbo | 20.08.1999 | 14.12.2007 | bestyrelse |
John Anderberg | 27.10.1989 | 10.08.2016 | bestyrelse |
Richard Sørensen | 27.10.1989 | 31.05.2001 | bestyrelse |
Kristian Baagø | 27.10.1989 | 09.03.2001 | bestyrelse |
Asger Jensen | 27.10.1989 | 11.04.1997 | bestyrelse |