Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Finn Andersson | 03.10.1984 | 27.10.1992 | direktion |
Steen Erik Mønsted | 03.10.1984 | 03.07.1992 | direktion |
Jesper Tange | 03.10.1984 | 24.02.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Finn Andersson | 03.10.1984 | 27.10.1992 | bestyrelse |
John Steenbeck | 03.10.1984 | 27.10.1992 | bestyrelse |
Peter Morgan Dahl | 03.10.1984 | 27.10.1992 | bestyrelse |
Preben Max Rabenhorst | 03.10.1984 | 03.07.1992 | bestyrelse |
Dan Bengtsson | 03.10.1984 | 03.07.1992 | bestyrelse |
Hans-Henning Bjerg-Pedersen | 03.10.1984 | 03.07.1992 | bestyrelse |
Preben Pihl Nygaard | 03.10.1984 | 03.07.1992 | bestyrelse |
Tage Husth Nielsen | 03.10.1984 | 19.10.1990 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Tange | 03.10.1984 | 24.02.1989 | bestyrelse |