Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Søndergaard Petersen | 01.09.1989 | 28.06.2022 | direktør |
Poul Hardy Søndergaard Petersen | 01.09.1989 | 13.04.1992 | direktør |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.09.1989 | 05.02.1990 | direktør |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Søndergaard Petersen | 01.09.1989 | 28.06.2022 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Karl Tommy William Windefeldt | 01.09.1989 | 28.06.2022 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Poul Hardy Søndergaard Petersen | 01.09.1989 | 28.06.2022 | formand |
Poul Erik Wendelboe | 01.09.1989 | 15.05.1998 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Erik Søren Petersen | 01.09.1989 | 13.04.1992 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.09.1989 | 05.02.1990 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.09.1989 | 05.02.1990 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.09.1989 | 05.02.1990 | formand |