Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Lomholt Poulsen | 01.09.1989 | 31.12.1993 | direktion |
Ole Boe Christiansen | 01.09.1989 | 14.02.1992 | direktion |
Karsten Kielland | 01.09.1989 | 23.04.1990 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.09.1989 | 07.12.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Lomholt Poulsen | 01.09.1989 | 31.12.1993 | bestyrelse |
Christian Frederik Harboe Wissum | 01.09.1989 | 31.12.1993 | formand |
Jens Poulsen | 01.09.1989 | 31.12.1993 | næstformand |
Torben Engholm | 01.09.1989 | 10.09.1993 | formand |
Tonny Alban Petersen | 01.09.1989 | 10.09.1993 | næstformand |
Leif Reinholdt Erlandsen | 01.09.1989 | 01.05.1992 | næstformand |
Carsten Dalgaard Hansen | 01.09.1989 | 14.02.1992 | bestyrelse |
Karsten Thorsted | 01.09.1989 | 11.12.1991 | formand |
Ole Boe Christiansen | 01.09.1989 | 29.07.1991 | bestyrelse |
Steen Buchanan Lademann | 01.09.1989 | 29.07.1991 | formand |
Poul Krogh | 01.09.1989 | 29.07.1991 | næstformand |
Karsten Kielland | 01.09.1989 | 06.02.1990 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Dalgaard Hansen | 01.09.1989 | 06.02.1990 | bestyrelse |
Poul Lomholt Poulsen | 01.09.1989 | 06.02.1990 | bestyrelse |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.09.1989 | 07.12.1989 | bestyrelse |
Charlotte Biil | 01.09.1989 | 07.12.1989 | bestyrelse |
Asbjørn Christoffersen | 01.09.1989 | 07.12.1989 | bestyrelse |