Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ole Falk Jonassen | 01.08.1989 | 11.09.1992 | direktion |
Mogens Brun | 01.08.1989 | 15.03.1991 | direktion |
Ove Pedersen | 01.08.1989 | 15.03.1991 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.08.1989 | 04.05.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mogens Rasmussen | 01.08.1989 | 11.09.1992 | bestyrelse |
Poul Amstrup | 01.08.1989 | 11.09.1992 | bestyrelse |
Ole Falk Jonassen | 01.08.1989 | 11.09.1992 | bestyrelse |
Leif Andersen | 01.08.1989 | 11.09.1992 | formand |
Mogens Brun | 01.08.1989 | 15.03.1991 | bestyrelse |
Palle Robert Christensen | 01.08.1989 | 15.03.1991 | bestyrelse |
Nils Juul Suhr Nordestgaard | 01.08.1989 | 15.03.1991 | formand |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.08.1989 | 04.05.1990 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.08.1989 | 04.05.1990 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.08.1989 | 04.05.1990 | formand |